US HB3742 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the U.S. courthouse located at 100 North Church Street in Las Cruces, New Mexico, as the "Edwin L. Mechem United States Courthouse."
Title
To designate the United States courthouse located at 100 North Church Street in Las Cruces, New Mexico, as the "Edwin L. Mechem United States Courthouse".
Sponsors
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Daniel Lungren [R-CA] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2012-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5102) |
2012-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3742. |
2012-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5102-5103) |
2012-07-23 | House | Mr. Bucshon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-07-19 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 149. |
2012-07-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-613. |
2012-06-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2012-06-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-12-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2011-12-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
Members of Congress
New Mexico
Senate
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Judges
Members of Congress
New Mexico
Senate