US HB375 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform .
Pending: House Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform .
Pending: House Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fix United States Government Contracting Deficit with China Act - Directs the Secretary of Commerce to certify annually to Congress: (1) a determination of whether the Chinese government has prohibited its procurement of U.S. goods during the preceding calendar year; and (2) the total value of U.S. goods procured by the Chinesse government during that year, if the Chinese government has not prohibited such procurement. Prohibits the head of each executive agency from awarding a contract for the procurement of Chinese goods during the succeeding calendar year if the Chinese government has prohibited procurement of U.S. goods during the preceding calendar year. Directs the Secretary of Transportation (DOT), in such an instance, to prohibit a state or other entity from using funds made available to it from the Highway Trust Fund or the Airport and Airway Trust Fund for the award of a contract for the procurement of Chinese goods during the succeeding calendar year. Limits the total value of Chinese goods that may be procured by the U.S. government during the succeeding calendar year to the total value of U.S. goods procured by the Chinese Government during the preceding calendar year, if in fact the Chinese government has not prohibited its procurement of U.S. goods during that preceding calendar year. Directs the International Trade Administration to establish a program to: (1) identify annually the total value of U.S. goods procured by the Chinese government; and (2) provide notice in the Federal Register on or as soon as practicable after the date on which the total value of Chinese goods procured by the U.S. government equals 50%, 75%, and 100% of the total value of U.S. goods procured by the Chinese government during the preceding calendar year, for purposes of compliance with the limitation required by this Act.
Title
Fix United States Government Contracting Deficit with China Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Larry Kissell [D-NC] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Lynn Woolsey [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform . |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2011-01-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2011-01-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2011-01-20 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2011-01-20 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-01-20 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2011-01-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement
Trade restrictions
Transportation programs funding
China
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement
Trade restrictions
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/375/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr375/BILLS-112hr375ih.pdf |