US HB3758 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Social Security Safety Dividend Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to disburse a $250 payment for a particular year to recipients of Social Security benefits, Supplemental Security Income (SSI) benefits (under title XVI of the Social Security Act), railroad retirement benefits, or veterans disability compensation or pension benefits if no cost-of-living adjustment (COLA) is payable for any month in such a year.
Title
Social Security Safety Dividend Act
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2011-12-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2011-12-20 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2011-12-20 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2011-12-20 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-12-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB539 (Related) 2011-03-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
HB2590 (Related) 2011-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB2711 (Related) 2011-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
HB2590 (Related) 2011-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB2711 (Related) 2011-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Subjects
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Poverty and welfare assistance
Railroads
Social security and elderly assistance
Transportation employees
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Inflation and prices
Poverty and welfare assistance
Railroads
Social security and elderly assistance
Transportation employees
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3758/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3758/BILLS-112hr3758ih.pdf |