US HB3758 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 314.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 314.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senior Safe Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill extends immunity from liability to certain individuals who, in good faith and with reasonable care, disclose the suspected exploitation of a senior citizen to a regulatory or law-enforcement agency. Specifically, this immunity shall apply to certain credit-union, depository-institution, investment-adviser, broker-dealer, transfer-agency, insurance-company, and insurance-agency employees who have received specified training related to identifying and reporting the suspected exploitation of a senior citizen. Similarly, the employing financial institution shall not be liable with respect to disclosures made by such employees. (Sec. 3) The bill allows financial institutions and third-party entities to offer training related to the suspected financial exploitation of a senior citizen to specified employees. The bill provides guidance regarding the content, timing, and record-maintenance requirements of such training.
Title
Senior Safe Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 314. |
2017-11-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-424. |
2017-10-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 60 - 0. |
2017-10-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-09-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB223 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S449-450)
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HB2255 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2155 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-174.
HB2255 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR905 (Similar To) 2018-05-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Aging
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Civil actions and liability
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Insurance industry and regulation
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Civil actions and liability
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Insurance industry and regulation