US HB3783 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rate Protection Act of 2013 - Amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to extend, from January 1, 2014, to January 1, 2015, the temporary high risk health insurance pool program providing health insurance coverage to uninsured individuals who have a preexisting condition. Appropriates additional funds to the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to pay claims that exceed the amount of premiums collected from the high risk pool's enrollees. Prohibits individuals who were not enrolled in the high risk health insurance pool program at the close of 2013 from enrolling in the program in 2014, but requires the Secretary to enable individuals to enroll in the federal government's high risk pool program if they are enrolled until the day before a high risk pool that was operated by a state or nonprofit private entity as of December 31, 2013, is terminated in 2014.
Title
Rate Protection Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-12-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3783/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3783/BILLS-113hr3783ih.pdf |