US HB3831 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Dialysis Pilot Program Review Act of 2014 - Prohibits the Secretary of Veterans Affairs from expanding the dialysis pilot program (established by the Secretary in 2009 to provide dialysis care to patients at certain Department of Veterans Affairs [VA] outpatient facilities) or creating any new dialysis capability provided by the VA in any facility other than an initial facility (one of four outpatient facilities the Secretary identified to participate in the program) until after: (1) the Secretary has implemented the pilot program at each initial facility for at least two years, (2) an independent analysis of the program has been conducted at each initial facility, and (3) the Secretary has submitted a report on such analysis to Congress. Requires the Secretary, in order to increase the access of veterans to dialysis care and decrease the travel time required to receive such care, to fully use existing VA dialysis resources, including any community dialysis provider with which the Secretary has entered into a contract or agreement to provide such care.
Title
Veterans Dialysis Pilot Program Review Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1547 (Related) 2013-10-30 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-280.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
HB5094 (Related) 2014-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 504.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
HB5094 (Related) 2014-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 504.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3831/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3831/BILLS-113hr3831ih.pdf |