US HB3864 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 449.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 449.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Reauthorization Act of 2017
Title
Native American Housing Assistance and Self-Determination Reauthorization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 449. |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-591. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 37 - 22. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-09-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1895 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Congressional oversight
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Government lending and loan guarantees
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing supply and affordability
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Low- and moderate-income housing
Native Americans
Public housing
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Congressional oversight
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Government lending and loan guarantees
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing supply and affordability
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Low- and moderate-income housing
Native Americans
Public housing
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs