US HB3884 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 132.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 132.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XI of the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize the program providing for sickle cell disease and other heritable blood disorders research, surveillance, prevention, and treatment.
Title
Sickle Cell Disease and Other Heritable Blood Disorders Research, Surveillance, Prevention, and Treatment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 132. |
2023-08-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-166. |
2023-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0. |
2023-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-07-13 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-13 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 0. |
2023-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |