US HB3941 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the use of the facilities of a public elementary school, a public secondary school, or an institution of higher education to provide shelter for aliens who have not been admitted into the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Schools Not Shelters Act
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Nicholas Langworthy [R-NY] |
Rep. Brandon Williams [R-NY] | Rep. Erin Houchin [R-IN] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] |
Roll Calls
2023-07-19 - House - On Passage RC# 340 (Y: 222 N: 201 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-07-19 - House - On Motion to Recommit RC# 339 (Y: 200 N: 212 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2023-07-19 - House - On Motion to Recommit RC# 339 (Y: 200 N: 212 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2023-07-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-07-19 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 201 (Roll no. 340). |
2023-07-19 | House | On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 200 - 212 (Roll no. 339). |
2023-07-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2023-07-18 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. R. 3941, the Chair put the question on the motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2023-07-18 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX. |
2023-07-18 | House | Mr. Vasquez moved to recommit to the Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2023-07-18 | House | H.Amdt.259 On agreeing to the Ogles amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2023-07-18 | House | The previous question was ordered on the amendment and the bill pursuant to the rule. |
2023-07-18 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 597, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Ogles amendment No. 1. |
2023-07-18 | House | H.Amdt.259 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Ogles. (consideration: CR H3680; text: CR H3680) |
2023-07-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3941. |
2023-07-18 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3935 and H.R. 3941. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3935 and H.R. 3941 both under a structured rule with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on each measure. |
2023-07-18 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 597. |
2023-07-18 | House | Rule H. Res. 597 passed House. |
2023-07-18 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 597 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3935 and H.R. 3941. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3935 and H.R. 3941 both under a structured rule with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on each measure. |
2023-06-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 102. |
2023-06-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 118-130. |
2023-06-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 16. |
2023-06-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-06-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2023-06-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR597 (Related) 2023-07-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2983 (Related) 2023-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2983 (Related) 2023-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.