US HB3964 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Addiction Prevention Act of 2017
Title
Opioid Addiction Prevention Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] |
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-10-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-10-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB892 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4408 (Related) 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB4408 (Related) 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3964/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3964/BILLS-115hr3964ih.pdf |