US HB3995 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the President to award the Medal of Honor to Major Charles S. Kettles of the United States Army for acts of valor during the Vietnam War. This bill authorizes the President to award the Medal of Honor to Charles S. Kettles for acts of valor during the Vietnam War.
Title
To authorize the President to award the Medal of Honor to Major Charles S. Kettles of the United States Army for acts of valor during the Vietnam War.
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2015-11-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2250 (Related) 2015-11-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB4909 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502.
SB2943 (Related) 2016-12-23 - Signed by President.
HB4909 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 502.
SB2943 (Related) 2016-12-23 - Signed by President.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3995/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3995/BILLS-114hr3995ih.pdf |