US HB3995 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Broadband Access for Veterans Act of 2017 This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to submit to Congress a report on promoting broadband Internet access service for veterans, in particular low-income veterans and veterans residing in rural areas. In preparing the report, the FCC shall provide the public with notice and an opportunity to comment.
Title
Improving Broadband Access for Veterans Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2017-10-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-10-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1950 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1625 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-141.
HB4986 (Related) 2018-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1625 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-141.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Rural conditions and development
Science, technology, communications
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3995/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3995/BILLS-115hr3995ih.pdf |