US HB4017 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Became Public Law No: 111-182.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Became Public Law No: 111-182.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 43 Maple Avenue in Shrewsbury, Massachusetts, as the "Ann Marie Blute Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 43 Maple Avenue in Shrewsbury, Massachusetts, as the "Ann Marie Blute Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Bill Delahunt [D-MA] | Rep. Barney Frank [D-MA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. John Olver [D-MA] |
Rep. John Tierney [D-MA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Became Public Law No: 111-182. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by President. | |
2010-06-01 | Presented to President. | |
2010-05-25 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-05-25 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-05-25 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4171-4172) | |
2010-05-18 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389. | |
2010-05-18 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report. | |
2010-05-17 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2010-04-16 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security. | |
2009-12-11 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. | |
2009-12-10 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-12-10 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 950). (text: CR 12/8/2009 H13574) | |
2009-12-10 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H14480) | |
2009-12-08 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lynch objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2009-12-08 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4017. | |
2009-12-08 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H13574-13576) | |
2009-12-08 | Mr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-11-18 | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-11-18 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-11-04 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Massachusetts
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Massachusetts
Postal service