US HB4064 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, and the Help America Vote Act of 2002 to provide increased protections for election workers and voters in elections for Federal office, and for other purposes.
Title
Preventing Election Subversion Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2155 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB2747 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 2747 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 420) entered in Senate.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
SB2747 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 2747 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 420) entered in Senate.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4064/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4064/BILLS-117hr4064ih.pdf |