US HB4084 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To repeal the amendments made to the Controlled Substances Act by the Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2016.
Title
To repeal the amendments made to the Controlled Substances Act by the Ensuring Patient Access and Effective Drug Enforcement Act of 2016.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-10-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-10-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1960 (Same As) 2017-10-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Licensing and registrations
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4084/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4084/BILLS-115hr4084ih.pdf |