US HB4095 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2014 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to increase, as of December 1, 2014, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children. Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.
Title
Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB569 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
HB570 (Related) 2013-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB4096 (Related) 2014-03-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB893 (Related) 2013-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 113-52.
SB2258 (Related) 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-181.
HB570 (Related) 2013-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB4096 (Related) 2014-03-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB893 (Related) 2013-11-21 - Became Public Law No: 113-52.
SB2258 (Related) 2014-09-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-181.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4095/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4095/BILLS-113hr4095ih.pdf |