US HB4131 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 152-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to expand access to home and community-based services (HCBS) under Medicaid, and for other purposes.
Title
Better Care Better Jobs Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1717 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1880 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1099 (Related) 2021-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2210 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1880 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1099 (Related) 2021-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2210 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4131/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4131/BILLS-117hr4131ih.pdf |