US HB4135 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 525.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to remove the statue of Albert Pike near Judiciary Square in the District of Columbia using nonfederal funds.
Title
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to remove the statue to the memory and in honor of Albert Pike erected near Judiciary Square in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 525. |
2020-12-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-640. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2020-07-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-08-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-07-30 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1018) |
2019-07-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Art, artists, authorship
District of Columbia
Government operations and politics
Monuments and memorials
U.S. history
District of Columbia
Government operations and politics
Monuments and memorials
U.S. history