US HB4171 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Freedom from Over-Criminalization and Unjust Seizures Act of 2012 - Amends the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 to repeal the prohibition on importing, exporting, transporting, selling, receiving, acquiring, or purchasing in interstate or foreign commerce: (1) fish or wildlife taken, possessed, transported, or sold in violation of foreign law; or (2) plants taken, possessed, transported, or sold in violation of foreign law, without the payment of appropriate royalties, taxes, or stumpage fees required by foreign law, or in violation of any limitation under foreign law that governs the export or transshipment of plants. Repeals the prohibition on possessing such fish, wildlife, or plants within the special maritime and territorial jurisdiction of the United States. Establishes a $200,000 maximum limit on a civil penalty for a knowing violation of such Act that involves fish, wildlife, or plants with a market value of $350 or more. Repeals: (1) criminal penalties under such Act, and (2) the authorization to suspend, modify, or cancel specified licenses or permits issued to any person who is convicted of a criminal violation of such Act.
Title
Freedom from Over-Criminalization and Unjust Seizures Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] |
Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] |
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] | Rep. Jean Schmidt [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2012-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2012-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2062 (Same As) 2012-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Environmental protection
Environmental regulatory procedures
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Trade restrictions
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Environmental protection
Environmental regulatory procedures
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Trade restrictions
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4171/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4171/BILLS-112hr4171ih.pdf |