US HB4185 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Courts, Public Defender Service, and Court Services and Offender Supervision Agency Act of 2014 - (Sec. 2) Amends the District of Columbia Code to authorize the Executive Officer of the District of Columbia courts to: collect debts owed to the District of Columbia Courts because of erroneous payments made to current and former court employees, or any other debt; and purchase uniforms to be worn by certain nonjudicial employees of the District courts, so long as the cost of furnishing a uniform during a year does not exceed the amount applicable to the uniform allowance for federal employees. (Sec. 3) Amends the National Capital Revitalization and Self-Government Improvement Act of 1997 (NCRS-GIA) to authorize the Director of the Court Services and Offender Supervision Agency to develop and operate intermediate incentive programs for sentenced offenders. Makes permanent the Director's authority to accept, solicit, and use on behalf of the Agency: (1) any monetary or nonmonetary gift, donation, bequest, or use of facilities, property, or services to aid or facilitate the work of the Agency; and (2) reimbursements from the District government for space and services provided, on a cost reimbursable basis. (Sec. 4) Amends the NCRS-GIA to: authorize the Public Defender Service, upon approval of the Board of Trustees, to accept and use public grants, private contributions, and voluntary and uncompensated (gratuitous) services to assist it. (Currently, the Service is authorized only to accept but not use these grants and contributions.); and deem members of the Board of Trustees, as of October 21, 1998, to be employees of the Service instead of District employees for purposes of any action brought against them.
Title
District of Columbia Courts, Public Defender Service, and Court Services and Offender Supervision Agency Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-07-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6150-6151) |
2014-07-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4185. |
2014-07-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6150-6152) |
2014-07-14 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-07-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 386. |
2014-07-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-514. |
2014-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2014-03-10 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E338) |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Debt collection
District of Columbia
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Lawyers and legal services
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local courts
State and local government operations
Debt collection
District of Columbia
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Lawyers and legal services
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local courts
State and local government operations