US HB4200 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 to prohibit the Attorney General (AG) or any federal official from administering or enforcing certain accessibility regulations relating to pools provided by public entities or at public accommodations. Prohibits regulations added under final rules issued by the AG entitled: (1) "Nondiscrimination on the Basis of Disability in State and Local Government Services" from being administered or enforced with respect to a pool provided by a public entity, and (2) "Nondiscrimination on the Basis of Disability by Public Accommodations and in Commercial Facilities" from being administered or enforced with respect to a pool at a public accommodation.
Title
To amend the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 to prohibit the Attorney General from administering or enforcing certain accessibility regulations relating to pools at public accommodations or provided by public entities.
Sponsors
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Rodney Alexander [R-LA] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Chip Cravaack [R-MN] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Jeffrey Landry [R-LA] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] |
Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Rep. Benjamin Quayle [R-AZ] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2012-03-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2186 (Same As) 2012-03-13 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 335.
SB2191 (Related) 2012-03-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 336.
SB2191 (Related) 2012-03-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 336.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Department of Justice
Disability and health-based discrimination
Sports and recreation facilities
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Department of Justice
Disability and health-based discrimination
Sports and recreation facilities
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4200/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4200/BILLS-112hr4200ih.pdf |