US HB4212 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the 15-year recovery period classification for qualified leasehold improvement, restaurant, and retail improvement property, for purposes of the depreciation tax deduction.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permanently extend the 15-year recovery period for qualified leasehold improvement property, qualified restaurant property, and qualified retail improvement property.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB749 (Related) 2013-04-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3948 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3939 (Related) 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
HB3948 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3939 (Related) 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Subjects
Business investment and capital
Food industry and services
Income tax deductions
Retail and wholesale trades
Taxation
Food industry and services
Income tax deductions
Retail and wholesale trades
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4212/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4212/BILLS-113hr4212ih.pdf |