US HB4213 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the Young Southeast Asian Leaders Initiative, and for other purposes.
Title
YSEALI Act Young Southeast Asian Leaders Initiative Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-09-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-08-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, Central Asia and Nonproliferation. |
2021-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4213/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4213/BILLS-117hr4213ih.pdf |