US HB4242 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 267.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 267.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires specified issuers of securities to disclose compensation information regarding executive officers and employees.
Title
Greater Accountability in Pay Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 267. |
2019-12-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-336. |
2019-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 21. |
2019-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-09-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Securities
Wages and earnings
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Securities
Wages and earnings