US HB4338 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
First Responders Support Act of 2009 - Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to: (1) increase death and disability benefits for public safety officers; (2) expand educational benefits for dependents of public safety officers killed or disabled in the line of duty; and (3) require the Bureau of Justice Assistance of the Department of Justice (DOJ) to adopt and apply a system for prioritizing claims for public safety officers' benefits based on the severity of a claim and the likelihood of its approval (grants automatic priority to a claim for death benefits or 100% disability). Authorizes the Director of the Bureau of Justice Assistance to make grants to organizations for reduced cost mental health services or counseling to public safety officers seriously injured in the line of duty and their families. Requires the Director to structure, design, and implement a performance measure for the Public Safety Officers Benefits program to monitor the claims process and payment of benefits to public safety officers and their beneficiaries and to report to Congress annually on the performance of the program and its activities.
Title
First Responders Support Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Charlie Melancon [D-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-12-16 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2441 (Related) 2009-06-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1037 (Related) 2009-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2885 (Same As) 2009-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1037 (Related) 2009-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2885 (Same As) 2009-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Disability and paralysis
Employee benefits and pensions
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Performance measurement
Student aid and college costs
Crime and law enforcement
Disability and paralysis
Employee benefits and pensions
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
Performance measurement
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/4338/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr4338/BILLS-111hr4338ih.pdf |