US HB4429 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restoring the Social Security COLA Act - Authorizes an increase of $250 in Social Security, certain veterans, Civil Service Retirement (CSRS), and Federal Employees Retirement (FERS) benefits for one month in 2010 to compensate for the lack of a cost-of-living adjustment for that year. Rescinds the unobligated balance of the discretionary appropriations made available by division A of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 in an amount determined by the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to be required to offset the increase in spending resulting from such increase.
Title
Restoring the Social Security COLA Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Adler [D-NJ] | Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. Mark Critz [D-PA] | Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] |
Rep. Eric Massa [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McMahon [D-NY] | Rep. John Mica [R-FL] | Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ] |
Rep. C.W. Young [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-21 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to House Appropriations | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to House Ways and Means | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Appropriations, Veterans' Affairs, Oversight and Government Reform, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3672 (Related) 2009-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Appropriations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Inflation and prices
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Inflation and prices
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/4429/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr4429/BILLS-111hr4429ih.pdf |