US HB444 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium Land Transfer Act - Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to convey to the Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium specified property in Anchorage, Alaska, for use in connection with health and related programs.
Title
Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium Land Transfer Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2011-01-25 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-01-25 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2011-01-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1298 (Related) 2011-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/444/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr444/BILLS-112hr444ih.pdf |