US HB4502 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 5, United States Code, to allow Federal agencies to establish educational requirements for certain cybersecurity positions in the competitive service, and for other purposes.
Title
Modernizing the Acquisition of Cybersecurity Experts Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2023-10-02 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 515 (Y: 394 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2023-10-02 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2023-10-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-10-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 1 (Roll no. 515). |
2023-10-02 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2023-10-02 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2023-10-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4502. |
2023-10-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-10-02 | House | Mr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 40 - 0. |
2023-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2023-07-10 | House | Introduced in House |