US HB4587 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-26 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 18.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-26 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 18.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration shall not issue an interim or final rule that includes an area closure in the South Atlantic for species managed under the Snapper-Grouper Fishery Management Plan until the South Atlantic Great Red Snapper Count study is complete and the data related to that study is integrated into the stock assessment.
Title
Red Snapper Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] |
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Laurel Lee [R-FL] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] |
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 18. |
2023-10-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-10-26 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged. |
2023-10-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-07-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-07-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-07-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-07-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/4587/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr4587/BILLS-118hr4587ih.pdf |