US HB4645 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-10)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 111-653, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 111-653, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Travel Restriction Reform and Export Enhancement Act - Prohibits the President from regulating or prohibiting travel to or from Cuba by U.S. citizens or lawful permanent residents or any transactions incident to such travel. States that: (1) any regulation restricting or prohibiting such Cuban travel shall have no effect; and (2) such prohibition shall not apply in time of war or armed hostilities between the United States and Cuba, or of imminent danger to the public health or the physical safety of U.S. citizens or legal residents. Makes such provisions applicable notwithstanding specified sections of the Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996 and the Trade Sanctions Reform and Export Enhancement Act of 2000. Amends the Trade Sanctions Reform and Export Enhancement Act of 2000 to define "payment of cash in advance" as the payment by the purchaser of an agricultural commodity or product and the receipt of such payment by the seller prior to: (1) the transfer of title of such commodity or product to the purchaser; and (2) the release of control of such commodity or product to the purchaser. Prohibits the President from restricting direct transfers from a Cuban financial institution to a U.S. financial institution executed in payment for a product authorized for sale under the Trade Sanctions Reform and Export Enhancement Act of 2000.
Title
Travel Restriction Reform and Export Enhancement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 111-653, Part I. | |
2010-06-30 | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 20. | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to House Financial Services | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to House Agriculture | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to House Foreign Affairs | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1531 (Related) 2009-03-16 - Referred to House Financial Services
SB1089 (Related) 2009-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3112 (Same As) 2010-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB1089 (Related) 2009-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3112 (Same As) 2010-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Agricultural trade
Caribbean area
Cuba
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Latin America
Presidents and presidential powers
Trade restrictions
Travel and tourism
Caribbean area
Cuba
International affairs
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Latin America
Presidents and presidential powers
Trade restrictions
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/4645/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr4645/BILLS-111hr4645ih.pdf |