US HB4686 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sami's Law This bill directs the Department of Transportation to withhold specified graduated percentages of a state's apportionment of certain federal-aid highway funds if the state has not enacted and is not enforcing certain transportation network company (TNC) vehicle identification laws. A "transportation network company" is an entity that uses a digital network to connect riders to drivers affiliated with the entity to transport the rider using a vehicle owned, leased, or otherwise authorized for use by the driver to a point chosen by the rider. States must require TNC drivers to display (1) a front and rear license plate; (2) a scannable quick response or similar code on the windows for riders to verify that they are entering the correct authorized vehicle; and (3) illuminated signs that are visible in both day and night, and readable from fifty feet. Drivers must also get periodic safety inspections of their ride-hailing vehicle. The bill prohibits the sale of illuminated TNC vehicle signs by any person other than a transportation network company and the display of such signs by individuals who are not authorized drivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sami's Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30SenateReceived in the Senate.
2020-07-29HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2020-07-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-07-29HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3921-3923)
2020-07-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4686.
2020-07-29HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3921-3927)
2020-07-29HouseMr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
2019-10-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2019-10-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-10-15HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3262 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
SB1871 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback