US HB4688 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Administrator of General Services to sell the property known as the Webster School.
Title
To direct the Administrator of General Services to sell the property known as the Webster School.
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2023-12-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-12-04 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. |
2023-12-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4688. |
2023-12-04 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-12-04 | House | Mr. Kean (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-11-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 221. |
2023-11-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 118-276. |
2023-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-27 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged |
2023-07-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2023-07-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2023-07-17 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E684) |
2023-07-17 | House | Introduced in House |