US HB4700 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes appropriations through FY2021 and provides direct hire authority for pipeline safety activities.
Title
Pipeline Safety Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] |
Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3432 (Related) 2019-11-20 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
HB5120 (Related) 2020-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 545.
HB5120 (Related) 2020-12-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 545.
Subjects
Accidents
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employee hiring
First responders and emergency personnel
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Minority employment
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women's employment
Emergency communications systems
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employee hiring
First responders and emergency personnel
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Minority employment
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women's employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4700/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4700/BILLS-116hr4700ih.pdf |