US HB4771 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-27 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the Federal Building and United States Courthouse located at 111 North Adams Street in Tallahassee, Florida, as the "Joseph Woodrow Hatchett United States Courthouse and Federal Building".
Title
To designate the Federal Building and United States Courthouse located at 111 North Adams Street in Tallahassee, Florida, as the "Joseph Woodrow Hatchett United States Courthouse and Federal Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] |
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-10-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-27 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2021-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-07-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-07-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2938 (Related) 2022-06-25 - Became Public Law No: 117-159.
HR1119 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1119 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4771/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4771/BILLS-117hr4771ih.pdf |