US HB478 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) to promulgate regulations within 180 days permitting individuals to import a prescription drug purchased from an approved Canadian pharmacy if the drug is dispensed by a pharmacist licensed in Canada; is purchased for personal use in quantities not greater than a 90-day supply; is filled using a valid prescription issued by a physician licensed to practice in the United States; and has the same active ingredients, route of administration, dosage form, and strength as a prescription drug approved by the FDA. Under the bill, certain drugs may not be imported, including controlled substances and biological products. The bill establishes a certification process for approving Canadian pharmacies. The FDA must publish a list of approved Canadian pharmacies.
Title
Safe and Affordable Drugs from Canada Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB61 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3384 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3384 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Canada
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Health
Prescription drugs
Trade restrictions
Canada
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Health
Prescription drugs
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/478/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr478/BILLS-116hr478ih.pdf |