US HB484 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To repeal the natural gas tax.
Title
Natural Gas Tax Repeal Act
Sponsors
Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Patrick Fallon [R-TX] |
Rep. Nathaniel Moran [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Elizabeth Van Duyne [R-TX] | Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] |
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Rep. Monica De La Cruz [R-TX] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] |
Rep. Lauren Boebert [R-CO] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Ronny Jackson [R-TX] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. |
2023-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1141 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 8.
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held.
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/484/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr484/BILLS-118hr484ih.pdf |