US HB4866 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-09 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-09 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lesser Prairie Chicken Voluntary Recovery Act of 2014 - Removes the Department of the Interior's listing of the lesser prairie chicken as threatened under the Endangered Species Act of 1973. Prohibits further treatment of the species as threatened or endangered before January 31, 2020. Requires Interior to monitor and submit an annual report on progress in the conservation of the lesser prairie chicken under: the Lesser Prairie-Chicken Range-Wide Conservation Plan of the Western Association of Fish and Wildlife Agencies, all related Candidate Conservation Agreements (agreements to voluntarily undertake measures to conserve a covered species), Candidate Conservation Agreements With Assurances (agreements to voluntarily undertake measures to conserve a covered species with assurances that additional measures will not be imposed if the species becomes listed in the future), conservation programs administered by the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service (USFWS), the Bureau of Land Management (BLM), and the Department of Agriculture (USDA), state conservation programs, and private conservation efforts. Prohibits the lesser prairie chicken from being treated as threatened or endangered beginning on January 31, 2020, unless Interior publishes a determination that conservation efforts under the Range-Wide Plan, agreements, programs, and efforts have not achieved the Plan's conservation goals.
Title
Lesser Prairie Chicken Voluntary Recovery Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] |
Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] |
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-09 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2677 (Related) 2014-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Animals
Birds
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animals
Birds
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4866/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4866/BILLS-113hr4866ih.pdf |