US HB4875 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-241. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-241. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the U.S. Postal Service located at 2201 E. Maple Street in North Canton, Ohio, as the "Lance Cpl. Stacy 'Annie' Dryden Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2201 E. Maple Street in North Canton, Ohio, as the "Lance Cpl. Stacy 'Annie' Dryden Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-241. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-21 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-11 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7220-7221) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5072) |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5072) |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged. |
2020-09-30 | House | Mr. Connolly asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2020-03-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-10-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Ohio
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Military personnel and dependents
Ohio
Postal service