US HB4889 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 229 - 158 (Roll no. 229).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 229 - 158 (Roll no. 229).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kelsey Smith Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Communications Act of 1934 to require a mobile or Internet voice service provider to disclose, at the request of an investigative or law enforcement officer, the call location information of a device that is: (1) used to place a 911 call, or (2) reasonably believed to be in the possession of an individual who is in an emergency situation that involves a risk of death or serious physical harm. Additionally, the bill prohibits a civil action or administrative proceeding against a mobile or Internet voice service provider who discloses call location information in good faith in accordance with this bill.
Title
Kelsey Smith Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Yoder [R-KS] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 229 N: 158 NV: 46 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 229 - 158 (Roll no. 229). |
2016-05-23 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2929) |
2016-05-23 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4889. |
2016-05-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2885-2888; text of measure as reported in House: CR H2885) |
2016-05-23 | House | Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-05-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 450. |
2016-05-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-580. |
2016-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-19 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2016-04-19 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-03-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2016-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2016-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2770 (Related) 2016-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Emergency communications systems
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Telephone and wireless communication
Crime and law enforcement
Emergency communications systems
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Telephone and wireless communication