US HB4998 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Secure and Trusted Communications Networks Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secure and Trusted Communications Networks Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate.
2019-12-16HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-16HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10282-10285)
2019-12-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4998.
2019-12-16HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10282-10286)
2019-12-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 281.
2019-12-16HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-352.
2019-12-16HouseMr. Doyle, Michael F. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-11-20HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-11-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-11-14HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-11-14HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-11-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2019-11-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-11-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4459 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback