US HB5003 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a debt collector from representing to servicemembers that failure to cooperate with a debt collector will result in a reduction of rank, a revocation of security clearance, or military prosecution. The Government Accountability Office must report on the impact of this prohibition on the timely delivery of information to servicemembers, military readiness, and national security.
Title
Fair Debt Collection Practices for Servicemembers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 79 (Y: 355 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 74) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2020-03-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 355 - 0 (Roll no. 79). (text: CR H1428) |
2020-03-02 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1433) |
2020-03-02 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-03-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5003. |
2020-03-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1428-1429) |
2020-03-02 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 54 - 0. |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Debt collection
Finance and financial sector
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Military personnel and dependents
Military readiness
National Guard and reserves
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Debt collection
Finance and financial sector
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Military personnel and dependents
Military readiness
National Guard and reserves