US HB5065 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-293.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-293.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bottles and Breastfeeding Equipment Screening Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to: notify air carriers, TSA security screening personnel, and private security screening personnel of TSA's 3-1-1 Liquids Rule Exemption guidelines allowing baby formula, breast milk, purified deionized water for infants, and juice on airlines; and include training on all special screening procedures for TSA security screening personnel and private security screening personnel.
Title
Bottles and Breastfeeding Equipment Screening Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-293. |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7108-7109) |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2016-09-27 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5950) |
2016-09-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5065. |
2016-09-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5950-5952) |
2016-09-27 | House | Mr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 606. |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-775. |
2016-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security. |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2016-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Child health
Department of Homeland Security
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Nutrition and diet
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Child health
Department of Homeland Security
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Nutrition and diet
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security