US HB5178 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 563.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 563.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Success on Campus Act of 2016 This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) provide educational and vocational counseling services for veterans at VA-selected institutions of higher learning, and (2) select locations where the maximum number of veterans would have access to such services. Such counseling shall be provided by VA employees who provide educational and vocational counseling services.
Title
Veterans Success on Campus Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 563. |
2016-09-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-727. |
2016-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2016-05-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2016-05-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Educational guidance
Higher education
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Educational guidance
Higher education
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education