US HB5288 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Common Sense Credit Union Capital Relief Act of 2018 This bill delays to 2021 the National Credit Union Administration rule titled "Risk-Based Capital" published on October 29, 2015. (The rule establishes a new method, beginning in 2019, for measuring whether a credit union is adequately capitalized.)
Title
Common Sense Credit Union Capital Relief Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4464 (Related) 2018-04-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 496.
HB5841 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 492.
SB488 (Related) 2018-07-18 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
SB3750 (Same As) 2018-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB5841 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 492.
SB488 (Related) 2018-07-18 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
SB3750 (Same As) 2018-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5288/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5288/BILLS-115hr5288ih.pdf |