US HB537 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the supplemental security income program to Puerto Rico, the United States Virgin Islands, Guam, and American Samoa, and for other purposes.
Title
Supplemental Security Income Equality Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB157 (Related) 2021-01-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
SB4486 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/537/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr537/BILLS-117hr537ih.pdf |