US HB5399 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-07 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ethical Patient Care for Veterans Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to ensure that each VA physician is informed of the duty to report any covered activity committed by another physician that the physician witnesses or otherwise directly discovers to the applicable state licensing authority within five days. Disciplinary Appeals Boards shall have exclusive jurisdiction to review any case of professional conduct or competence arising from a VA physician's failure to properly report such activity. "Covered activity" means any activity occurring in a VA medical facility that consists of or causes the provision of impaired, incompetent, or unethical health care that requires direct reporting under the Code of Medical Ethics of the American Medical Association.
Title
Ethical Patient Care for Veterans Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-12-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7241) |
2016-12-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5399. |
2016-12-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7241-7242) |
2016-12-06 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 639. |
2016-11-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 114-815. |
2016-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-06-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health care quality
Health personnel
Medical ethics
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health care quality
Health personnel
Medical ethics
Veterans' medical care