US HB5490 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Coastal Barrier Resources Act to expand the John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System, and for other purposes.
Title
Bolstering Ecosystems Against Coastal Harm Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-12-06 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged |
2023-09-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-09-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-09-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-09-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2958 (Related) 2024-04-20 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5490/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5490/BILLS-118hr5490ih.pdf |