US HB553 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-12 - Assigned to the Consensus Calendar, Calendar No. 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-12 - Assigned to the Consensus Calendar, Calendar No. 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updates the Department of Defense's Survivor Benefit Plan and how it operates in relation to other benefits. The plan currently provides a monthly annuity (based on a percentage of a service member's retirement pay) to an eligible beneficiary upon the death of the service member. Currently, if a surviving spouse is also entitled to dependency and indemnity compensation, the annuity paid under the plan will be reduced. The bill repeals certain provisions that require the offset of the plan annuity from amounts paid in dependency and indemnity compensation. Under current law, upon the request of the surviving spouse, the military branch concerned is authorized to pay an annuity to the member's dependent children instead of to the surviving spouse. The bill restores the annuity to an eligible spouse who previously elected to transfer payment to a dependent child.
Title
Military Surviving Spouses Equity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Assigned to the Consensus Calendar, Calendar No. 1. |
2019-05-16 | House | Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Mr. Wilson (SC). |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB622 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR476 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR476 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/553/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr553/BILLS-116hr553ih.pdf |