US HB5663 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make Sanctuary Cities Pay for the Wall Act of 2018 This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish a DHS account for the planning, design, and construction of a U.S.-Mexico border barrier. Certain housing, community development, and public works appropriations for sanctuary cities, localities, or states shall be withheld and deposited into such account. DHS: (1) may decline to transfer an alien in its custody to a sanctuary jurisdiction regardless of whether such jurisdiction has issued a writ or warrant, (2) shall not transfer an alien under a final order of removal (or a restatement of an order of removal) to a sanctuary jurisdiction, and (3) shall determine and report to Congress each year which political subdivisions or states are sanctuary jurisdictions.
Title
Make Sanctuary Cities Pay for the Wall Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2018-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, Financial Services, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Border security and unlawful immigration
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Economic development
Executive agency funding and structure
Housing and community development funding
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Border security and unlawful immigration
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Economic development
Executive agency funding and structure
Housing and community development funding
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5663/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5663/BILLS-115hr5663ih.pdf |