US HB5683 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect and provide humanitarian assistance to Armenians in Armenia and Nagorno-Karabakh impacted by actions taken by the Government of Azerbaijan, and for other purposes.
Title
Supporting Armenians Against Azerbaijani Aggression Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Kevin Mullin [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D-TX] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Daniel Goldman [D-NY] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Seth Magaziner [D-RI] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Jake Auchincloss [D-MA] |
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Gabe Amo [D-RI] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-09-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2900 (Same As) 2023-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB3000 (Related) 2023-11-17 - Held at the desk.
HB7288 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB3000 (Related) 2023-11-17 - Held at the desk.
HB7288 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5683/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5683/BILLS-118hr5683ih.pdf |